EP0125626 - Improvement in molybdenum-coated aluminium cathodes for alkali metal/sulfur battery cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1989 [1989/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damrow, Paul A. 1562 Oak Royal Drive Concord, Cal. 94521 / US | 02 /
Tsang, Floris Y. 342 Mangroove Way Walnut Creek, Cal. 94598 / US | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/47] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte H.Weickmann Dr. K.Fincke F.A.Weickmann B.Huber Dr. H.Liska Dr. J.Prechtel Dr. B.Böhm, Möhlstrasse 22, Postfach 860 820 W-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105253.3 | 09.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | US19830494595 | 13.05.1983 Original published format: US 494595 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125626 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125626 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125626 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, H01M10/39, C01G39/02 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
H01M10/3909 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | Mit Molybden bekleidete Aluminiumkathoden für Alkali-Metall-Schwefel-Batterieelemente | [1984/47] | English: | Improvement in molybdenum-coated aluminium cathodes for alkali metal/sulfur battery cells | [1984/47] | French: | Cathodes en aluminium recouvertes de molybdène pour les piles de batteries métal-alcalin-soufre | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/47] | 27.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3749603 (STRINGHAM R, et al); | [AD]US3985575 (LUDWIG FRANK A); | [A]GB1471914 (BRITISH RAILWAYS BOARD); | [AD]FR2371782 (CHLORIDE SILENT POWER LTD [GB]); | [A]GB1595192 (CHLORIDE SILENT POWER LTD) | [A] - THIN SOLID FILMS, vol. 83, no. 4, September 1981, pages 417-428, Lausanne, CH; K.R. KINSMAN et al.: "The use of coatings in high temperature battery systems" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 4, January 1980, page 197, no. 25487b, Columbus, Ohio, US; T.L. MARKIN et al.: "Current collectors for sodium-sulfur batteries", & POWER SOURCES 1978 (Pub. 1979), 7, 757-67 |