EP0125671 - Improvements on containers for storage batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stocchiero, Olimpio 4 Via Kennedy I-36050 Montorso Vicentino / IT | [1984/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [1984/47] | Bonini, Ercole Corso Fogazzaro, 8 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 84105416.6 | 12.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | IT19830085564 | 17.05.1983 Original published format: IT 8556483 | [1984/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125671 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125671 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125671 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02, H01M2/10 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
H01M50/258 (EP);
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M50/227 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | Behälter für Speicherbatterien | [1984/47] | English: | Improvements on containers for storage batteries | [1984/47] | French: | Bacs d'accumulateurs | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 16.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB102056 (WALKER WILLIAM LOUIS [US]); | [A]GB481891 (INDIA RUBBER GUTTA PERCHA TELE, et al); | [A]US2385127 (CARLILE FRANK S); | [A]FR1448994 (FULMEN); | [A]FR1491546 (CONST MECANIQUES ET AERONAUTIQ); | [A]US3338452 (OAKLEY MICHAEL J, et al); | [A]DE2522094 (MASCH & WERKZEUGBAU GMBH); | [A]GB2076584 (MACK MOLDING CO INC) | [A] - DESIGN ENGINEERING, May 1978, page 11; "Lead-calcium grid eliminates battery maintenance" |