EP0129057 - Anti-corrosion agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1986 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lechler Chemie GmbH Kornwestheimer Strasse 107 Postfach 400 560 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | For all designated states Lechler Chemie GmbH Kornwestheimer Strasse 107 Postfach 400 560 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Öchsner, Waldemar, Dr. Dipl.-Chem Königsallee 80 D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Stöckl, Franz Im Hummerholz 49 D-7057 Leutenbach-2 / DE | 03 /
Riedlinger, Karl, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Oskar-Schwenk-Strasse 14 D-7035 Waldenbuch / DE | [1984/52] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Ing. Eugen Maier Dr. Ing. Eckhard Wolf Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | Patentanwälte Dr. Ing. Eugen Maier Dr. Ing. Eckhard Wolf Hauptmannsreute 93 D-70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105490.1 | 15.05.1984 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | DE19833317817 | 17.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3317817 | [1984/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129057 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C04B13/20, E04C5/01 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
C09D1/06 (EP);
C04B28/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B22/12, C04B22/16, C04B24/06, C04B24/10, C04B24/18, C04B24/24, C04B24/32, C04B24/36, C04B24/383 (EP);
C04B28/02, C04B22/12, C04B22/16, C04B24/06, C04B24/10, C04B24/22, C04B24/24, C04B24/32, C04B24/36, C04B24/383 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/52] | Title | German: | Korrosionsschutzmittel | [1984/52] | English: | Anti-corrosion agent | [1984/52] | French: | Anti-corrosif | [1984/52] | File destroyed: | 11.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 28.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/09] | 27.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH348096 ; | [X]GB829051 ; | [X]DE2357506 ; | [X]DE1621443 ; | [X]DE1965375 ; | [X]DE1771509 ; | [A]US3087825 ; | [A]DD159424 |