EP0126456 - Navigation apparatus for automotive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endo, Akira 5-48, Bizencho Mito-shi / JP | 02 /
Takezaki, Jiro Boda-Apartment House 214-go 2593 Takaba Katsuta-shi / JP | 03 /
Tsujii, Fumio 1060, Suifucho Mito-shi / JP | 04 /
Shibata, Takanori 4-12-15, Onumacho Hitachi-shi / JP | [1984/48] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/48] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105670.8 | 18.05.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | JP19830089141 | 23.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8914183 | [1984/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0126456 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126456 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/22, G09B29/10 | [1984/48] | CPC: |
G01C21/367 (EP,US);
G09B29/10 (KR);
G01C21/22 (KR);
G09B29/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Navigation von Kraftfahrzeugen | [1984/48] | English: | Navigation apparatus for automotive | [1984/48] | French: | Dispositif de navigation pour automobiles | [1984/48] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 03.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0073618 [ ] (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | FR2492971 [ ] (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | DE2910386 [ ] (TELDIX GMBH) |