EP0130343 - Process for manufacturing flat knitted hand coverings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.08.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIM-Strickwarenfabrik Michael-Lohs GmbH & Co. KG Traunring 2-6 D-8225 Traunreut / DE | [1985/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dzial, Egon Jalan Dato Klana 138 Seremban N.S. / MY | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Liebau, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Liebau & Liebau Postfach 22 02 29 D-86182 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Liebau, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Liebau & Liebau Postfach 22 02 29 D-86182 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105808.4 | 22.05.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | DE19833323971 | 02.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3323971 | [1985/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130343 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A41D19/00, D04B1/28 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
D04B1/28 (EP);
A41D19/04 (EP);
A41D2500/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von flachgestrickten Fausthandschuhen | [1985/02] | English: | Process for manufacturing flat knitted hand coverings | [1985/02] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de moufles tricotées à plat | [1985/02] | File destroyed: | 11.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 06.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/40] | 16.05.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.06.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR380570 ; | [A]GB191214818 ; | [A]FR2106928 ; | [A]DE804911 ; | [A]US2090982 |