EP0130345 - Integrated lighting and camera system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corby, Nelson Raymond, Jr. 116 Washington Road Scotia New York 12302 / US | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105820.9 | 22.05.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | US19830500508 | 02.06.1983 Original published format: US 500508 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130345 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130345 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130345 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, G06F15/70 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
G01B11/2522 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/02] | G06F15/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Integriertes Beleuchtungs- und Kamerasystem | [1985/02] | English: | Integrated lighting and camera system | [1985/02] | French: | Dispositif intégré de caméra et d'éclairage | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 13.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4298286 (MAXEY CARL W, et al); | [A]US4105925 (ROSSOL LOTHAR, et al); | [A]US4165939 (SIMMONS JORGE E [US], et al); | [A]DE2810192 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE); | [A]DE1423606 (UNITED STATES STEEL CORP) |