EP0132532 - Cylinder for a rotary printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Hermann Pferseer Strasse 15 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1985/07] | Application number, filing date | 84105957.9 | 25.05.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | DE19833326215 | 21.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3326215 | [1985/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132532 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132532 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12, B41F7/22 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
B41F27/1293 (EP,US);
B41F27/125 (EP,US);
B41F30/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/07] | Title | German: | Zylinder für eine Rotationsdruckmaschine | [1985/07] | English: | Cylinder for a rotary printing machine | [1985/07] | French: | Cylindre pour une machine rotative d'impression | [1985/07] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH321129 (R W CRABTREE & SONS LIMITED [GB]); | [A]FR2496557 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]); | [A]GB2094716 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG); | [A]EP0060939 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) |