EP0128449 - A wheel, in particular for a toy building set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
LEGO A/S Aastvej 1 7190 Billund / DK | For:GB
Interlego AG Sihlbruggstrasse 3 6340 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
LEGO A/S Aastvej 1 DK-7190 Billund / DK | ||
For:GB
Interlego A.G. Sihlbruggstrasse 3 CH-6340 Baar / CH | |||
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states LEGO A/S Aastvej 1 DK-7190 Billund / DK | ||
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states INTERLEGO A/S Aastvej 1 DK-7190 Billund / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bach, Erik Molleparken 258 DK-7190 Billund / DK | 02 /
Dideriksen, Erling Thue Sonderkaer 424 DK-7190 Billund / DK | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Glaeser, Joachim, et al Diehl Glaeser & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 22767 Hamburg / DE | [2008/32] |
Former [1988/18] | Glaeser, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Königstrasse 28 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1984/51] | Glaeser, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Königstrasse 28 D-2000 Hamburg 50 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84106095.7 | 29.05.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | DK19830002633 | 09.06.1983 Original published format: DK 263383 | [1984/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0128449 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0128449 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128449 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63H17/26 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
A63H33/042 (EP,US);
A63H17/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/51] | Title | German: | Rad, insbesondere für ein Baukastenspiel | [1984/51] | English: | A wheel, in particular for a toy building set | [1984/51] | French: | Roue, en particulier pour un jeu de construction | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 18.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3566536 (BAYNES WILLIAM R, et al); | [Y]DE1603541 (POWELEIT WILHELM); | [A]US3638356 (BRANCHE HARVEY W LA); | [A]DE2152212 (SCHUCO SPIELWAREN SCHREYER); | [A]DE2805138 (BETTAG BIG SPIELWAREN); | [A]DE2901247 (TONKA CORP) |