EP0130384 - A two phase voltage signal generating circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1988 [1988/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Fumio c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84106194.8 | 30.05.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | JP19830096381 | 31.05.1983 Original published format: JP 9638183 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130384 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130384 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/15, H03K4/94 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
H03K5/151 (EP,US);
H03K4/94 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/02] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Erzeugung zweiphasiger Spannungssignale | [1985/02] | English: | A two phase voltage signal generating circuit | [1985/02] | French: | Circuit pour générer des signaux biphasés de tension | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/31] | 04.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 04.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3577138 (KAWASHIMA MASAO, et al) | [A] - HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, vol. 30, no. 5, May 1979, W. HÜTTEMANN et al. "A precision programmable pulse generator", pages 3-10 |