EP0129798 - Fungicidal azole compounds, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roeser, Karl, Dr. Muldweg 11 D-6945 Hirschberg / DE | 02 /
Buschmann, Ernst, Dr. Georg-Ludwig-Krebs-Strasse 10 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Ammermann, Eberhard, Dr. Sachsenstrasse 3 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Pommer, Ernst-Heinrich, Dr. Berliner Platz 7 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [1985/01] | Application number, filing date | 84106861.2 | 15.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | DE19833322526 | 23.06.1983 Original published format: DE 3322526 | [1985/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129798 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, C07D231/12, C07D233/60, C07D235/06, A01N43/64, A01N43/50, A01N43/52, A01N43/56 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
A01N43/50 (EP);
A01N43/653 (EP);
C07C45/63 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/63, C07C49/233 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | Fungizide Azolverbindungen, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1985/01] | English: | Fungicidal azole compounds, their preparation and use | [1985/01] | French: | Composés d'azole fongicides, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1985/01] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 18.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 14.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0055833 [ ]; | DE3048266 [ ]; | DE3011258 [ ]; | DE3140276 [ ]; | DE3003933 [ ] |