EP0166014 - Catalyst prepared from organomagnesium compound, organic hydroxyl-containing compound, reducing halide source and a transition metal-organozinc complex [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuentes, Ricardo, Jr. 12513 Parkciel Drive Baton Rouge Louisiana / US | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107291.1 | 25.06.1984 | [1986/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0166014 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/62 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/637 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/01] | Title | German: | Katalysator, hergestellt aus einer Organomagnesium-Verbindung, einer organischen Hydroyl enthaltenden Verbindung, einer reduzierenden Halogenied-Quelle und einem Übergangsmetall-Organozink-Komplex | [1986/01] | English: | Catalyst prepared from organomagnesium compound, organic hydroxyl-containing compound, reducing halide source and a transition metal-organozinc complex | [1986/01] | French: | Catalyseur préparé à partir d'un composé organomagnésien d'un composé organique contenant un groupement hydroxyle, d'une source d'halogénure réductrice et d'un complexe métal de transition-organo zinc | [1986/01] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 10.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 16.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/34] | 25.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4246383 (GESSELL DONALD E); | [A]EP0053632 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]US4381253 (SHIPLEY RANDALL S); | [L]US4456547 (FUENTES JR RICARDO [US]) |