EP0134450 - Process for preparing aqueous polymer dispersions, and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 11.07.1990 [1990/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eck, Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Burg 11 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
Jira, Reinhard, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Haydnstrasse 13 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | [1985/12] | Application number, filing date | 84107403.2 | 28.06.1984 | [1985/12] | Priority number, date | DE19833323810 | 01.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3323810 | [1985/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134450 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134450 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134450 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/26, C08F4/28, C09J3/14, D21H3/38 | [1985/12] | CPC: |
C08F2/20 (EP,US);
C08J3/16 (EP,US);
G03C2001/0471 (EP,US);
Y10S526/91 (EP,US);
Y10S526/911 (EP,US);
Y10S526/915 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1985/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung wässriger Polymerdispersionen und ihre Verwendung | [1985/12] | English: | Process for preparing aqueous polymer dispersions, and their use | [1985/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dispersions aqueuses de polymères et leur usage | [1985/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.06.1984 | Examination requested [1985/12] | 14.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.06.1989 | CH | 30.06.1989 | LI | 30.06.1989 | [1990/28] |
Former [1990/17] | GB | 28.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2388602 (MOGENS KIAR); | [A]GB854191 (BRITISH CELANESE); | [A]US3784491 (POZORSKI R) |