EP0129913 - Alphaolefin terpolymer and coating composition including said terpolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine Wisconsin 53403-5011 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine, Wisconsin 53403-5011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verbrugge, Calvin J. 1031 Ohio Street Racine, WI 53405 / US | 02 /
Hansen, Frederick C. 19022 - 58th Road Union Grove, WI 53182 / US | 03 /
Kiehlbauch, Richard A. 1649 Meadow Lane Avenue Racine, WI 53406 / US | [1989/32] |
Former [1985/01] | 01 /
Verbrugge, Calvin J. 1031 Ohio Street Racine Wisconsin, 53405 / US | ||
02 /
Hansen, Frederick C. 19022 - 58th Road Union Grove Wisconsin 53182 / US | |||
03 /
Kiehlbauch, Richard A. 1649 Meadow Lane Avenue Racine Wisconsin 53406 / US | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107406.5 | 27.06.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | US19830508697 | 28.06.1983 Original published format: US 508697 | US19830508698 | 28.06.1983 Original published format: US 508698 | [1985/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129913 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129913 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F222/04, C08F210/14, C09D3/74 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
C08F210/14 (EP);
C08F222/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F222/04, C08F210/14, C08F210/14, C08F212/00 (EP);
C08F210/14, C08F212/08, C08F222/06, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/17 (EP);
C08F210/14, C08F222/06, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | Terpolymer eines alpha-Olefins und Beschichtungszusammensetzung, dieses Terpolymer enthaltend | [1989/32] | English: | Alphaolefin terpolymer and coating composition including said terpolymer | [1985/01] | French: | Terpolymère d'alpha oléfine et composition de revêtement contenant ce terpolymère | [1985/01] |
Former [1985/01] | Terpolymer einer alpha-Olefin und Beschichtungszusammensetzung dieses Terpolymer enthaltend | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/25] | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 19.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0066798 ; | [X]US4240916 |