EP0131232 - Stereoselective process for the preparation of anthracycline derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1988 [1988/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROBIAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 14-23, Kamiosaki 3 Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | For all designated states MICROBIAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 14-23, Kamiosaki 3 Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umezawa, Hamao, Prof. 4-23, Toyotama-kita Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Tomio 5-1-11, Higashi-gotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tatsuta, Kuniaki 2-26-7, Matsunoki Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Yoshikazu 3-2-3, Sakuragaoka Tama-city Tokyo / JP | [1985/03] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107671.4 | 03.07.1984 | [1985/03] | Priority number, date | JP19830123885 | 07.07.1983 Original published format: JP 12388583 | [1985/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131232 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131232 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/252 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07H15/252 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/03] | C07H15/24 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1985/03] | Title | German: | Stereoselektives Verfahren zur Herstellung von Anthracyclin-Derivaten | [1985/03] | English: | Stereoselective process for the preparation of anthracycline derivatives | [1985/03] | French: | Procédé stéréosélectif pour la préparation de dérivés d'anthracyclines | [1985/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 26.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0014853 (MICROBIAL CHEM RES FOUND [JP]); | [Y]EP0039060 (MICROBIAL CHEM RES FOUND [JP]); | [Y]GB2002754 (MICROBIAL CHEM RES FOUND) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, vol. 32, no. 10, October 1979, pages 1082-1084, Tokyo, JP; H. UMEZAWA et al.: "Tetrahydropyranyl derivatives of daunomycin and adriamycin" |