EP0134468 - Receiving amplifier for the amplification of a photo current [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.07.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | For all designated states TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 D-74072 Heilbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moser, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Breslauer Strasse 53 D-7100 Heilbronn / DE | 02 /
Militzer, Karl, Ing. grad. Breslauer Strasse 55 D-7100 Heilbronn / DE | [1985/12] | Representative(s) | Maute, Hans-Jürgen DaimlerChrysler AG, Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH, Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107735.7 | 04.07.1984 | [1985/12] | Priority number, date | DE19833325926 | 19.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3325926 | [1985/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134468 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134468 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/30 | [1985/12] | CPC: |
H03G3/3084 (EP,US);
H03F3/08 (EP,US);
H04B10/693 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/12] | Title | German: | Empfangsverstärker zur Verstärkung eines Photostromes | [1985/12] | English: | Receiving amplifier for the amplification of a photo current | [1985/12] | French: | Récepteur amplificateur d'un courant photoélectrique | [1985/12] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 12.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1989/36] | 16.04.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3968361 (BUMGARDNER JON H); | [Y]DE2937232 (SENNHEISER ELECTRONIC); | [A]US3576452 (SMITH LAWRENCE R); | [A]DE3136565 (LOEWE OPTA GMBH [DE]) |