EP0131284 - Storage control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omoda, Koichiro 15-3, Fuchinobehoncho-4-chome Sagamihara-shi / JP | 02 /
Nagashima, Shigeo 1200-13, Katakuracho Hachioji-shi / JP | [1985/03] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/03] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107937.9 | 06.07.1984 | [1985/03] | Priority number, date | JP19830123245 | 08.07.1983 Original published format: JP 12324583 | [1985/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0131284 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0131284 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131284 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/347 | [1985/03] | CPC: |
G06F15/8084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/42] |
Former [1985/03] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Speichersteuergerät | [1985/03] | English: | Storage control apparatus | [1985/03] | French: | Appareil de commande de mémoire | [1985/03] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 14.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5731078 ; | [A]JP5822446 ; | [A]US3919534 (HUTSON MAURICE L, et al); | [A]EP0061096 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [X] - P.M. KOGGE: "The architecture of pipelined computers", 1981, pages 150-155, Hemisphere Publishing Corp., US | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 100 (P-121)[978], 9th June 1982; & JP-A-57 31 078 (FUJITSU K.K.) 19-02-1982, & JP5731078 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 96 (P-193)[1241], 22nd April 1983; & JP-A-58 22 446 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 09-02-1983, & JP5822446 A 00000000 |