EP0133222 - Process for the biological purification of exhaust gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1987 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Friedrich, Dr. In den Birken 77 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1985/08] | Application number, filing date | 84108003.9 | 09.07.1984 | [1985/08] | Priority number, date | DE19833326057 | 20.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3326057 | [1985/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133222 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0133222 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/00 | [1985/08] | CPC: |
C02F3/025 (EP,US);
B01D53/84 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US);
Y10S210/916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur biologischen Abluftreinigung | [1985/08] | English: | Process for the biological purification of exhaust gases | [1985/08] | French: | Procédé de purification biologique de gaz d'échappement | [1985/08] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 23.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2237929 (SCHUMACHER SCHE FABRIK); | [A]US3828525 (COPA W, et al); | [A]US4203838 (NAKAMURA KATUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0074100 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |