EP0132696 - Silencer for valve devices in compressed-air systems, particularly in the compressed-air brake systems of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1989 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 80710 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 D-80710 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states Knorr-Bremse GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mrosek, Helmut Christoph-von-Gluck-Platz 14 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 02 /
Pellecuer, François Leonhard-Frank-Strasse 1 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 03 /
Schuhbeck, Christian Schopfgraben 21 D-8160 Miesbach / DE | [1985/07] | Application number, filing date | 84108071.6 | 10.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | DE19833327902 | 02.08.1983 Original published format: DE 3327902 | [1985/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132696 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132696 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132696 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/00, F01N1/10 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
B60T17/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/07] | Title | German: | Geräuschdämpfer für Ventilanordnungen in Druckluftanlagen, insbesondere in Druckluftbremsanlagen von Fahrzeugen | [1985/07] | English: | Silencer for valve devices in compressed-air systems, particularly in the compressed-air brake systems of vehicles | [1985/07] | French: | Silencieux pour des dispositifs de soupape dans les installations d'air comprimé, en particulier dans les installations d'air comprimé des freins de véhicules | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 22.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.03.1988 | FR | 30.03.1988 | IT | 30.03.1988 | NL | 30.03.1988 | SE | 31.03.1988 | CH | 31.07.1988 | LI | 31.07.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 30.03.1988 | |
IT | 30.03.1988 | ||
NL | 30.03.1988 | ||
SE | 31.03.1988 | ||
CH | 31.07.1988 | ||
LI | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1990/02] | BE | 30.03.1988 | |
NL | 30.03.1988 | ||
SE | 31.03.1988 | ||
CH | 31.07.1988 | ||
LI | 31.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/21] | BE | 30.03.1988 | |
NL | 30.03.1988 | ||
SE | 31.03.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | BE | 30.03.1988 | |
NL | 30.03.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 30.03.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2451530 (WABCO FAHRZEUGBREMSEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2932777 (SIMSHEUSER KARL FRIEDRICH) |