EP0134997 - Method for automatic type-font recognition without prior knowledge of the text contents, utilizing a representation of the text document by desriptors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scherl, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Kafkastrasse 54 D-8000 München / DE | [1985/13] | Application number, filing date | 84108083.1 | 10.07.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | DE19833325645 | 15.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3325645 | [1985/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134997 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134997 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/60, G06K9/48 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
G06V30/182 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/13] | G06K9/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Schriftarterkennung ohne Vorwissen über den Textinhalt mit Hilfe einer Beschreibung der Textvorlage durch Deskriptoren | [1985/13] | English: | Method for automatic type-font recognition without prior knowledge of the text contents, utilizing a representation of the text document by desriptors | [1985/13] | French: | Procédé pour la reconnaissance automatique du type de caratères sans connaissance préalable du contenu du texte, en utilisant une représentation du document par des informations descriptives | [1985/13] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 20.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/36] | 02.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/36] | Request for further processing for: | 11.07.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP5880781 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, München, 19.-22. Oktober 1982, Seiten 1234-1240, Computer Society Press; J.T. TOU et al.: "Automatic type font identification for falsified documents" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, München, 19.-22. Oktober 1982, Seiten 610-613, Computer Society Press; T. PAVLIDIS et al.: "Vector and arc encoding of graphics and text" | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 176 (P-214)[1321], 4. August 1983; & JP-A-58 80 781 (RICOH K.K.) 14-05-1983, & JP5880781 A 00000000 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, München, 19.-22. Oktober 1982, Seite 1206, Computer Press Society; W. SCHERL et al.: "Text coding and recognition by flexible descriptors" |