EP0132708 - Crystalline metal aluminophosphates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states UOP 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | ||
Former [1985/07] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Stephen Thomas 1024 East Main Street Shrub Oak New York 10588 / US | 02 /
Flanigen, Edith Marie 502 Woodland Hills Road White Plains New York 10603 / US | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Eggert, Hans-Gunther Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Eggert, Hans-Gunther, Dr. Räderscheidtstrasse 1 D-50935 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108182.1 | 12.07.1984 | [1985/07] | Priority number, date | US19830514334 | 15.07.1983 Original published format: US 514334 | [1985/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132708 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132708 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132708 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/45, B01J27/18, B01J20/00 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
C07C5/224 (EP,US);
B01J27/18 (EP,US);
B01J29/84 (EP,US);
C07C2/54 (EP,US);
C07C4/06 (EP,US);
C07C5/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C5/2716, C07C15/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/07] | Title | German: | Kristalline Metall-Aluminium-Phosphate | [1985/07] | English: | Crystalline metal aluminophosphates | [1985/07] | French: | Phosphates cristallins d'aluminium et de métal | [1985/07] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 19.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1990 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55160059 ; | [A]US4251350 (JOHNSON MARVIN F L, et al); | [A]EP0043562 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0054267 (HEUBACH HANS DR GMBH CO KG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 35 (C-46)[707], 5th March 1981; & JP-A-55 160 059 (TEIKOKU KAKOU K.K.) 12-12-1980, & JP55160059 A 00000000 |