EP0131920 - Controlled temperature expansion in oxygen production by molten alkali metal salts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. P.O. Box 538 Allentown, Pennsylvania 18105 / US | [1985/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erickson, Donald C. 1704 S. Harbor Lane Annapolis, MD 21401 / US | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108214.2 | 12.07.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | US19830514742 | 18.07.1983 Original published format: US 514742 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0131920 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0131920 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131920 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/02 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
C01B13/0292 (EP,US);
C01B13/02 (KR);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/04] | Title | German: | Kontrollierter Anstieg der Temperatur bei der Herstellung von Sauerstoff durch eine Alkalimetallsalz-Schmelze | [1985/04] | English: | Controlled temperature expansion in oxygen production by molten alkali metal salts | [1985/04] | French: | Expansion contrôlée de la température dans la préparation d'oxygène au moyen de sels fondus de métaux alcalins | [1985/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 27.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4340578 (ERICKSON DONALD C); | [AD]US4287170 (ERICKSON DONALD C); | [AD]US4132766 (ERICKSON DONALD C); | [AD]US3856928 (TARMAN P, et al) |