EP0133233 - Data transfer apparatus for use with a flexible magnetic disk or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 21.06.1989 [1989/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEAC CORPORATION 3-7-3, Naka-cho Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/08] | For all designated states TEAC CORPORATION 3-7-3, Naka-cho Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuyuguchi, Hiroshi 11-8, Syoan 3-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Morita, Tsutomu TEAC-nishikuboryo, 3-7 Nishikubo 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shoji, Makoto Fussa-danchi 7-503 2-16, Minamidenen Fussa-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1985/08] | Representative(s) | Wey, Hans-Heinrich, et al c/o Kanzlei Hansmann, Vogeser und Partner Albert Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/08] | Wey, Hans-Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Kanzlei Hansmann, Vogeser und Partner Albert Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108222.5 | 12.07.1984 | [1985/08] | Priority number, date | JP19830139699 | 29.07.1983 Original published format: JP 13969983 | [1985/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133233 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0133233 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/00 | [1985/08] | CPC: |
G11B33/10 (EP,US);
G11B19/02 (EP,KR,US);
G11B19/00 (EP,US);
G11B19/20 (EP,US);
G11B5/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/08] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Datenübertragung zur Verwendung mit einer flexiblen Magnetplatte und dergleichen | [1985/08] | English: | Data transfer apparatus for use with a flexible magnetic disk or the like | [1985/08] | French: | Appareil de transfert de données employé avec un disque magnétique flexible | [1985/08] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 09.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 28.10.1987 | LI | 28.10.1987 | SE | 31.10.1987 | [1989/25] |
Former [1989/21] | SE | 31.10.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | GB1432693 [ ] (INFORMATION STORAGE SYSTEMS); | FR2326006 [ ] (THOMSON BRANDT [FR]); | FR2458128 [ ] (TELECOMM ELECTRON FRANC); | GB2072407 [ ] (HITACHI LTD) |