EP0131924 - Method for producing hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daido Sanso K.K. 72-1, Unagidani-nakanocho Minamiku Osaka 542 / JP | [1985/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakui, Tadahiro Haitu-kimura 201, 3-4-9, Soka, Soka-shi Saitama 340 / JP | 02 /
Handa, Tadahiko 2-10-80, Sakasegawa, Takarazuka Hyogo 665 / JP | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108223.3 | 12.07.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | JP19830130119 | 15.07.1983 Original published format: JP 13011983 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131924 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131924 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/04, C07C1/12 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
C07C1/0425 (EP,US);
C07C1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1985/04] | English: | Method for producing hydrocarbons | [1985/04] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'hydrocarbures | [1985/04] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1984 | Examination requested [1985/04] | 07.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2320923 [ ] (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | FR2370712 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | FR2434793 [ ] (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD [GB]); | DE3226616 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | US4413063 [ ] (AUDIBERT FRANCOIS [FR], et al) | [ ] - ULLMANNS "Encyklopadie der technischen Chemie", 4th edition, vol. 7, 1974 VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH, Weinheim pages 298, 299 * Page 299, left-hand column, line 16 * | [ ] - ULLMANNS "Encyklopadie der technnischen Chemie", 4th editon, vol. 13, 1977 VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH, Weinheim pages 560, 561 * Page 561, lkines 11-15, 17, 18, 21-23; fig. 25 * | Examination | - ULLMANNS "Encyklopädie der technischen Chemie", 4th ed., vol. 13, 1977, VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH, Weinheim (DE), pp. 560, 561 |