EP0131958 - Production of non cyclic polyalkylene polyamines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. Route no. 222 Trexlertown Pennsylvania 18087 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. Route no. 222 Trexlertown Pennsylvania 18087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Thomas Albert RD 1, Bobby Lane Orefield, PA 18069 / US | 02 /
Ford, Michael Edward RD 3 Center Valley, PA 18034 / US | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Sandmair, Kurt, et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 D-81629 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/04] | Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108425.4 | 17.07.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | US19830515314 | 19.07.1983 Original published format: US 515314 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131958 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131958 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C85/06, C07C87/20 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
A01N33/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Herstellung von nichtcyclischen Polyalkylenpolyaminen | [1985/04] | English: | Production of non cyclic polyalkylene polyamines | [1985/04] | French: | Production de polyalkylène polyamines non-cycliques | [1985/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 25.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4362886 (FORD MICHAEL E, et al); | [Y]EP0073520 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [YP]US4448997 (BRENNAN MICHAEL E [US]) |