EP0135057 - Demodulator for multilevel amplitude modulation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Yasuharu c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108699.4 | 23.07.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | JP19830134119 | 22.07.1983 Original published format: JP 13411983 | JP19830134120 | 22.07.1983 Original published format: JP 13412083 | [1985/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0135057 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135057 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/06, H04L27/06 | [1985/13] | CPC: |
H04L25/067 (EP,US);
H04L27/3809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1985/13] | Title | German: | Demodulator für ein Mehrpegelamplitudenmoduliertes Signal | [1985/13] | English: | Demodulator for multilevel amplitude modulation system | [1985/13] | French: | Démodulateur pour un signal modulé à plusieurs niveaux d'amplitude | [1985/13] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1984 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 16.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [APD]JP58101449 ; | [E]EP0120474 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [AP]EP0104449 (NEC CORP [JP]) | [APD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 204, 9 September 1983, & JP-A-58-101449 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 16-06-1983, & JP58101449 A 19830909 |