EP0175003 - Adjustable interior pipe cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montiero, Richard 419 South K Street Lake Worth Florida 33460 / US | For all designated states Bob Maye Associates Limited 5 Algonquin Drive Marlborough New Jersey 07746 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states Montiero, Richard 419 South K Street Lake Worth Florida 33460 / US | ||
For all designated states Bob Maye Associates Limited 5 Algonquin Drive Marlborough New Jersey 07746 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Montiero, Richard 419 South K Street Lake Worth Florida 33460 / US | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84108738.0 | 24.07.1984 | [1986/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175003 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0175003 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23D21/14 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
B23D21/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/13] | Title | German: | Einstellbare Rohrinnenschneidvorrichtung | [1986/13] | English: | Adjustable interior pipe cutter | [1986/13] | French: | Dispositif ajustable pour le découpage de tubes de l'intérieur | [1986/13] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/31] | 01.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/31] | 08.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB918923 (CHARLES WICKSTEED & COMPANY LT); | [A]US2814105 (SMITH ROBERT K); | [A]US2731718 (GOSS HARRY E); | [A]US3883950 (KURTZ ARTHUR L) |