EP0137931 - Drive unit for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Hurth Maschinen- und Zahnradfabrik GmbH & Co Moosacher Strasse 36 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states Carl Hurth Maschinen- und Zahnradfabrik GmbH & Co Moosacher Strasse 36 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichinger, Johann Edelweissweg 28 D-8011 Vaterstetten / DE | [1985/17] | Application number, filing date | 84108983.2 | 28.07.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | DE19833337695 | 17.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3337695 | DE19840012522U | 21.04.1984 Original published format: DE 8412522 U | [1985/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0137931 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0137931 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137931 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B61C9/44, B61C9/50 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
B61C9/50 (EP,US);
B61C9/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/17] | Title | German: | Antriebsaggregat für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1985/17] | English: | Drive unit for railway vehicles | [1985/29] | French: | Unité de traction pour véhicule ferroviaire | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 09.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH243954 (OERLIKON MASCHF [CH]); | [Y]DE2756445 (HURTH MASCH ZAHNRAD CARL); | [Y]DE2843830 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]EP0025409 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |