EP0133984 - Process for insulating electrical conductors by impregnation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTHOM 38, avenue Kléber F-75784 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [1986/02] |
Former [1985/11] | For all designated states ALSTHOM-ATLANTIQUE Société Anonyme dite: 38, avenue Kleber F-75794 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anton, Alain Rue de Beauregard Chaponnay F-69360 Saint-Symphorien d'Ozon / FR | [1987/37] |
Former [1985/11] | 01 /
Anton, Alain Rue de Beauregard Chaponnay F-69360 Saint Symphorien d'Ozon / FR | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109045.9 | 31.07.1984 | [1985/11] | Priority number, date | FR19830012807 | 03.08.1983 Original published format: FR 8312807 | [1985/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133984 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0133984 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/40, C08G18/00, C08G59/40 | [1985/11] | CPC: |
H01B3/30 (EP,US);
C08G18/003 (EP,US);
C08G18/1875 (EP,US);
H01B3/008 (EP,US);
H01B3/04 (EP,US);
H01B3/082 (EP,US);
H01B3/303 (EP,US);
H01B3/40 (EP,US);
C08G2115/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49002 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/11] | Title | German: | Isolierungsverfahren durch Imprägnierung von elektrischen Leitungen | [1985/11] | English: | Process for insulating electrical conductors by impregnation | [1985/11] | French: | Procédé d'isolation par imprégnation de conducteurs électriques | [1985/11] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 20.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3020262 (SPERANZA GEORGE P); | [Y]US3313747 (SCHRAMM CHARLES H); | [Y]US3334110 (SCHRAMM CHARLES H); | [Y]US3876618 (CLARKE JAMES A) |