EP0133686 - Chlorosulfonated polyolefin process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron Ohio 44318 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/10] | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio 44318 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benedikt, George Martin 12900 Lake Avenue Lakewood Ohio 44107 / US | 02 /
Hodge, Ion Moir 1400 Vineyard Drive Broadview Heights Ohio 44147 / US | [1985/10] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1985/10] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109169.7 | 02.08.1984 | [1985/10] | Priority number, date | US19830520357 | 04.08.1983 Original published format: US 520357 | [1985/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133686 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/38 | [1985/10] | CPC: |
C08F8/38 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/38, C08F110/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Chlorsulfonierung von Olefinpolymerisaten | [1985/10] | English: | Chlorosulfonated polyolefin process | [1985/10] | French: | Procédé de chlorosulfonation de polyoléfines | [1985/10] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/19] | 03.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2349565 ; | [AD]US3258445 ; | [AD]US2928819 ; | [XE]EP0103704 |