EP0134544 - Variable band distributed switching node with dynamic hybrid-frame management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Turin / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gabrielli, Luciano Via Torino, 93/3 Leini (To) / IT | 02 /
Lotito, Nicola Via Madonna del Ponte, n 1 Avigliana (To) / IT | 03 /
Sposini, Maurizio Via Brusà, 10 Valdellatorre (To) / IT | [1990/17] |
Former [1985/12] | 01 /
Gabrielli, Luciano Via Torino, 93/3 Leini (To) / IT | ||
02 /
Lotito, Nicola Via Madonna de Ponte, n. 1 Avigliana (To) / IT | |||
03 /
Sposini, Maurizio Via Brusà, 10 Valdellatorre (To) / IT | Representative(s) | Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Kanzlei Landshut Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton, et al Van der Werth, Lederer & Riederer Postfach 2664 D-84010 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109261.2 | 03.08.1984 | [1985/12] | Priority number, date | IT19830067845 | 04.08.1983 Original published format: IT 6784583 | [1985/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134544 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134544 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134544 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04Q11/04, H04L12/54, H04L12/58, H04L12/28 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
H04M11/06 (EP,US);
H04L12/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/12] | H04M11/06, H04Q11/04, H04L11/20, H04L11/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/12] | Title | German: | Knotenpunkt eines verteilten Vermittlungssystems mit veränderlicher Bandbreite und mit dynamischer Verwaltung von Hybridrahmen | [1985/12] | English: | Variable band distributed switching node with dynamic hybrid-frame management | [1985/12] | French: | Noeud d'un système de commutation distribué à bande variable avec attribution dynamique de trames hybrides | [1985/12] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.04.1990 | FR | 25.04.1990 | NL | 25.04.1990 | SE | 25.04.1990 | GB | 03.08.1990 | CH | 31.08.1990 | LI | 31.08.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1991/43] | BE | 25.04.1990 | |
NL | 25.04.1990 | ||
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
GB | 03.08.1990 | ||
CH | 31.08.1990 | ||
LI | 31.08.1990 | ||
FR | 14.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/41] | BE | 25.04.1990 | |
NL | 25.04.1990 | ||
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
GB | 03.08.1990 | ||
FR | 14.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/36] | BE | 25.04.1990 | |
NL | 25.04.1990 | ||
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
FR | 14.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/23] | BE | 25.04.1990 | |
NL | 25.04.1990 | ||
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | NL | 25.04.1990 | |
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | SE | 25.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1269116 (SITS SOC IT TELECOM SIEMENS [IT]); | [A]US4154983 (PEDERSEN THOMAS J [US]); | [A]EP0059149 (DEVAULT MICHEL [FR], et al) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 1981 NATIONAL AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, vol. 1, 19th-21st May 1981, pages 350-356, IEEE, Dayton, US; M.J. ROSS et al.: "A distributed processing architecture for voice/data switching" | [A] - NATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, vol. 1/4, 29th November - 3rd December 1981, pages 1-5, IEEE, New Orleans, US; M.J. ROSS et al.: "Performance analysis of hybrid (circuit/packet) switching concepts" | [A] - COMSAT TECHNICAL REVIEW, vol. 6, no. 1, Spring 1976, pages 127-158, Washington, US; S.J. CAMPANELLA: "Digital speech interpolation" |