EP0135756 - High voltage flash lamp circuit and emergency signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/14] | Emergency signal | ||
[1989/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Light Systems 4230 El Cajon Boulevard San Diego California 92105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states Life Light Systems 4230 El Cajon Boulevard San Diego California 92105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scolari, John E. 7881 La Mesa Blvd. La Mesa CA 92041 / US | 02 /
Warner, Robert T. 14230 Jerome Dr. Poway CA 92064 / US | 03 /
Deavenport, Joe E. 5062 Edgeworth Road San Diego CA 92109 / US | [1985/14] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/14] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109425.3 | 08.08.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | US19830521276 | 08.08.1983 Original published format: US 521276 | US19840632308 | 23.07.1984 Original published format: US 632308 | [1985/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0135756 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135756 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q7/00, H05B41/34, F21L11/00 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
B60Q7/00 (EP,US);
E01F9/617 (EP,US);
E01F9/654 (EP,US);
E01F9/688 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/14] | Title | German: | Hochspannungs-Blitzleuchtenansteuerschaltung und Notsignal | [1989/14] | English: | High voltage flash lamp circuit and emergency signal | [1989/14] | French: | Circuit de commande pour lampes-flash à haute tension et signal de détresse | [1989/14] |
Former [1985/14] | Notsignal | ||
Former [1985/14] | Emergency signal | ||
Former [1985/14] | Signal de détresse | Examination procedure | 09.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 23.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.1987 | 31.08.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1990/27] | BE | 31.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | GB889849 [ ] (ALEXANDER KENYON AND COMPANY L); | FR1563638 [ ]; | DE2131512 [ ] (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER); | DE1589150 [ ] (EISEMANN GMBH); | GB1354134 [ ] (ROLLEI WERKE FRANKE HEIDECKE); | CH181282 [ ] (TELEFUNKEN GMBH [DE]); | DE2246974 [ ] (ROLLEI WERKE FRANKE HEIDECKE); | DE2326952 [ ]; | US3973168 [ ] (KEARSLEY WAYNE A); | GB2088157 [ ] (FUJI KOEKI CORP); | GB1251701 [ ]; | DE2830907 [ ] (KAPLAN ALBERT); | US3933117 [ ] (MAIETTA PETER J); | GB2080859 [ ] (BOSE HERBERT); | CH524207 [ ] (VARTA GMBH [DE]); | FR2076701 [ ] (MARCOULT CLAUDE) |