EP0150258 - Method for propagating unknown digital values in a hardware based complex circuit simulation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALID LOGIC SYSTEMS, INC. 2820 Orchard Parkway San Jose California 95314 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states VALID LOGIC SYSTEMS, INC. 2820 Orchard Parkway San Jose California 95314 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widdoes, Curtis L., Jr. 19700 Duff Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109638.1 | 13.08.1984 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | US19840575367 | 30.01.1984 Original published format: US 575367 | [1985/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150258 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/26, G01R31/28 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
G06F11/261 (EP);
G06F30/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fortpflanzung unbekannter Digitalwerte in einem Simulationssystem mit hardwarebasiertem Komplexschaltkreis | [1985/32] | English: | Method for propagating unknown digital values in a hardware based complex circuit simulation system | [1985/32] | French: | Méthode de propagation de valeurs numériques inconnues dans un système de simulation à circuit matériel complexe | [1985/32] | File destroyed: | 17.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/41] | 07.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |