EP0139950 - Lamp holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULO-Werk Moritz Ullmann GmbH + Co. KG Robert-Bosch-Strasse 1-12 D-7340 Geislingen / DE | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stopp, Walter Hofackerstrasse 17/1 D-7345 Deggingen / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Robert Silcherweg 14 D-7901 Westerstetten / DE | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, Dr.-Ing., et al Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte Hospitalstrasse 8 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 84109704.1 | 15.08.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | DE19833332762 | 10.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3332762 | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0139950 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0139950 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F21Q1/00, B60Q1/26 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
F21S43/195 (EP);
F21S41/192 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Lampenträger | [1985/19] | English: | Lamp holder | [1985/19] | French: | Douille de lampe | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 23.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.11.1987 | [1995/40] |
Former [1991/27] | NL | 11.11.1987 | |
Former [1989/10] | NL | 11.11.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3798588 (HOWE J, et al); | [A]DE2460857 (REINSHAGEN KABELWERK GMBH) | Examination | DE3147514 |