EP0139952 - Process for preparing a soya jelly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hugelshofer, Alison Alpenstrasse 15 CH-3510 Konolfingen / CH | [1985/19] | Application number, filing date | 84109717.3 | 16.08.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | CH19830005128 | 21.09.1983 Original published format: CH 512883 | [1985/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0139952 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0139952 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/20, A23L1/187, A23L1/04 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
A23L11/07 (EP);
A23L29/256 (EP);
A23L9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Sojagelees | [1985/19] | English: | Process for preparing a soya jelly | [1985/19] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une gelée de soja | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1984 | Examination requested [1985/19] | 10.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5513028 ; | [A]US4000326 (OKADA KATSUTO, et al) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 38(C-4)(520), 27 mars 1980, page 113C4; & JP - A - 55 13028 (SUGIYAMA SANGIYOU KAGAKU KENKIYUUSHIYO) 29-01-1980, & JP5513028 A 00000000 |