EP0140010 - Ship's propulsion plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENK TACKE GmbH Gögginger Strasse 73 86159 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states RENK TACKE GmbH Gögginger Strasse 73 D-86159 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states F. Tacke KG Rodder Damm D-4440 Rheine 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terörde, Erwin Schwalbenweg 1 D-4440 Rheine / DE | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Arendt, Helmut Patentanwalt Roscherstrasse 12 30161 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Arendt, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Bergiusstrasse 2 c D-30655 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110247.8 | 29.08.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | DE19833331480 | 01.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3331480 | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0140010 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0140010 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140010 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B63J3/02, B63H21/30 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
B63H21/305 (EP);
B63J3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/19] | Title | German: | Schiffsantriebsanlage | [1985/19] | English: | Ship's propulsion plant | [1985/19] | French: | Ensemble de propulsion pour bateaux | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 27.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2499504 ; | [Y]DE2422639 ; | [Y]GB2076350 ; | [Y]NL24885C ; | [A]FR2259748 ; | [A]GB2098561 |