EP0137290 - Resin composition having electromagnetic wave shielding effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1988 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeshi, Nabeta 3450-13, Honmachida Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Isamu, Hanahara c/o Chuken Machida-Ryo 5-25-18, Morino Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | [1985/16] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110394.8 | 31.08.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | JP19830164353 | 07.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16435383 | JP19830169909 | 14.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16990983 | JP19830227019 | 02.12.1983 Original published format: JP 22701983 | JP19830247068 | 28.12.1983 Original published format: JP 24706883 | JP19840046277 | 10.03.1984 Original published format: JP 4627784 | [1985/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0137290 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0137290 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137290 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/24, C08K3/04 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
H05K9/009 (EP,US);
C08K7/06 (EP,US);
H01B1/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K7/06, C08L55/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/16] | H01B1/24 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1985/16] | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung mit einer Schutzwirkung gegen elektromagnetische Wellen | [1985/16] | English: | Resin composition having electromagnetic wave shielding effect | [1985/16] | French: | Composition résineuse ayant un effet de protection d'onde électromagnétique | [1985/16] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2198226 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) |