EP0138015 - Apparatus and method for generating a spiral gas stream in a pipeline [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/17] | Apparatus and method for the generation and utilization of a spiral gas stream in a pipeline | ||
[1988/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachidori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | For all designated states Horii, Kiyoshi No. 8-15-501, Kamimeguro 5-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachidori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651 / JP | ||
For all designated states Horii, Kiyoshi No. 8-15-501, Kamimeguro 5-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marui, Tomohiro No. 29-16, Hachimanyama 3-Chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takarada, Masaaki No. 4-14, Inagedaicho Chiba City Chiba Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Shimura, Yoshiaki No. 29-1-305, Bessho Nakazatodai Minami-ku Yokohama City Kanagawa Prefecture / JP | 04 /
Mita, Minoru No. 4-1, Minamicho 2-Chome Chiba City Chiba Prefecture / JP | 05 /
Horii, Kiyoshi No. 8-15-501, Kamimeguro 5-Chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Skuhra, Udo, et al ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Skuhra, Udo, et al Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/17] | Skuhra, Udo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise Patentanwälte, Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110434.2 | 03.09.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | JP19830161214 | 03.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16121483 | JP19830164191 | 08.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16419183 | JP19830164192 | 08.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16419283 | JP19830200731 | 28.10.1983 Original published format: JP 20073183 | JP19840000034 | 05.01.1984 Original published format: JP 3484 | JP19840000035 | 05.01.1984 Original published format: JP 3584 | JP19840052240 | 21.03.1984 Original published format: JP 5224084 | JP19840080251 | 23.04.1984 Original published format: JP 8025184 | JP19840094505 | 14.05.1984 Original published format: JP 9450584 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138015 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138015 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F15D1/00, B65G53/52, B65G53/58, B01D21/26 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
F15D1/0015 (EP,US);
B65G53/526 (EP,US);
B65G53/58 (EP,US);
Y10S423/09 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Spiralgasstromes in einer Rohrleitung | [1988/18] | English: | Apparatus and method for generating a spiral gas stream in a pipeline | [1988/18] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour la génération d'un courant de gaz hélicoidal dans un tuyau | [1988/18] |
Former [1985/17] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erzeugung und Nutzung eines Spiralgasstromes in einer Rohrleitung | ||
Former [1985/17] | Apparatus and method for the generation and utilization of a spiral gas stream in a pipeline | ||
Former [1985/17] | Appareil et méthode pour la génération et l'utilisation d'un courant de gaz hélicoidal dans un tuyau | Examination procedure | 16.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 20.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2203762 (GOGNEAU ACHILLE [FR]); | [Y]FR2416857 (GOGNEAU ACHILLE [FR]); | [A]FR2333732 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO [US]); | [A]US3696934 (OISI SABURO); | [A]GB805956 (WESTIN & BACKLUND AB); | [A]GB907937 (VACU BLAST LTD); | [A]FR1565069 |