EP0143910 - Pivoting valve with a servo motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1988/17] |
Former [1985/24] | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramisch, Jan Feldstrasse 19B CH-5442 Fislisbach / CH | [1985/24] | Application number, filing date | 84110441.7 | 03.09.1984 | [1985/24] | Priority number, date | CH19830005321 | 30.09.1983 Original published format: CH 532183 | [1985/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143910 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143910 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/22, F16K31/163 | [1985/24] | CPC: |
F16K1/221 (EP,US);
F16K1/22 (KR);
F16K31/163 (KR);
F16K31/1635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/24] | Title | German: | Drehklappe mit Servomotor | [1985/24] | English: | Pivoting valve with a servo motor | [1985/24] | French: | Clapet pivotant à servo-moteur | [1985/24] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/26] | 15.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2084339 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US3771759 (PAUQUETTE J); | [A]FR2304957 (AMRI [FR]); | [A]US4211263 (KENNEDY HARRY L [US], et al) | Examination | US4054156 |