EP0143915 - Device for a printing press with a forme cylinder and an offset cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.10.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1985/24] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöneberger, Edgar F. Hainstädter Strasse 32 D-6453 Seligenstadt 2 / DE | [1985/24] | Representative(s) | Marek, Joachim c/o M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/24] | Marek, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. c/o M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110611.5 | 06.09.1984 | [1985/24] | Priority number, date | DE19833342662 | 25.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3342662 | [1985/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143915 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143915 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143915 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/00 | [1985/24] | CPC: |
B41F13/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung an einer Druckmaschine, bestehend aus einem Platten- und/oder Gummizylinder | [1985/24] | English: | Device for a printing press with a forme cylinder and an offset cylinder | [1985/24] | French: | Dispositif pour une machine à imprimer comportant un cylindre à cliché et un cylindre à blanchet | [1985/24] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 04.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.1988
18.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE Miller-Johannisberg Druckmaschinen GmbH Friedrich-Bergius-Strasse 5 Postfach 12 9207 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Biebrich / DE Opponent's representative Roever, Harry Am Bogen 23 Postfach 51 03 40 D-6800 Mannheim 51 / DE | 02
15.12.1988
28.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.1988
18.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE Miller-Johannisberg Druckmaschinen GmbH Friedrich-Bergius-Strasse 5 Postfach 12 9207 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Biebrich / DE Opponent's representative Roever, Harry Am Bogen 23 Postfach 51 03 40 D-6800 Mannheim 51 / DE | ||
02
15.12.1988
28.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | |||
Former [1988/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.09.1988
18.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE Miller-Johannisberg Druckmaschinen GmbH Friedrich-Bergius-Strasse 5 Postfach 12 9207 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Biebrich / DE Opponent's representative Roever, Harry Am Bogen 23 Postfach 51 03 40 D-6800 Mannheim 51 / DE | 01.02.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.06.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.07.1989 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1989/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1990/18] | CH | 16.03.1988 | |
LI | 16.03.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE430367 (WINKLER MASCHF, et al); | [A]DE1277868 (KOENIG & BAUER SCHNELLPRESSFAB [DE]); | [Y]DE3007801 (STORK BRABANT BV [NL]) |