EP0140066 - Device for detecting forces, tensions or accelerations at machines, apparatuses or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1989 [1989/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobler, Klaus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Bettäckerstrasse 12 D-7016 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
Heinz, Rudolf, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Eltinger Weg 26 D-7253 Renningen / DE | [1985/19] | Application number, filing date | 84110674.3 | 07.09.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | DE19833333285 | 15.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3333285 | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140066 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140066 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/20, G01L23/22 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
F16B31/028 (EP);
G01L1/20 (EP);
G01L23/18 (EP);
G01L23/221 (EP);
G01L5/243 (EP);
G01L9/0002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/19] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Erfassen von Kräften, Spannungen bzw. Beschleunigungen an Maschinen, Geräten oder dgl. | [1985/19] | English: | Device for detecting forces, tensions or accelerations at machines, apparatuses or the like | [1985/19] | French: | Dispositif pour la détection de forces, tensions resp. des accélérations de machines, appareils ou similaires | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/19] | 17.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2917406 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [AD]DE2902305 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [AD]DE3006656 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |