EP0141171 - Process for recovering lacquer material from overspray produced by lacquer spraying, and device for carrying out the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richter, Wolfgang Dipl. Ing. Augsburger Strasse 23 D-8946 Memmingerberg / DE | [1985/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1989/45] |
Former [1986/11] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/20] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110710.5 | 07.09.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | DE19833332457 | 08.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3332457 | [1985/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141171 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141171 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/02, B05B15/12, B05B15/04 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
B05B14/465 (EP,US);
B01D69/141 (EP,US);
B05B14/462 (EP,US);
B05B14/463 (EP,US);
B05B16/40 (EP,US);
B01D2313/143 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Lackiermaterial aus dem beim Spritzlackieren entstehenden Overspray und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung de Verfahrens | [1985/20] | English: | Process for recovering lacquer material from overspray produced by lacquer spraying, and device for carrying out the process | [1985/20] | French: | Procédé pour récupérer de la matière de lacquage à partir de l'excédent produit lors du lacquage par pulvérisation et dispositif pour exécuter le procédé | [1985/20] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 05.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/33] | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M12) | 25.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/40] | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/40] | 29.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.04.1987 | M02   Fee paid on   05.06.1987 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 13.07.1990 | [1990/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2315125 (MECKLER JOSEPH G); | [A]DE2322792 (DUERR O FA); | [A]DE2433193 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG); | [A]GB2007542 (CARRIER DRYSYS LTD); | [A]EP0015734 (CHAMPION SPARK PLUG CO [US]); | [Y]EP0065382 (PROTECTAIRE SYST [US]); | [Y]EP0081167 (SCHAEFER GMBH FRITZ [DE]) |