EP0149717 - Projectile head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1988 [1988/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall GmbH Pempelfurtstrasse 1 40880 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | For all designated states Rheinmetall GmbH Pempelfurtstrasse 1 D-40880 Ratingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Witt, Wolfram, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Am Gentenberg 100 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Scholles, Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Karl-Rüsing-Strasse 7 D-4005 Meerbusch 2 / DE | [1985/31] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Ralf Holger in Firma Rheinmetall GmbH Ulmenstrasse 125 Postfach 6609 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | Behrens, Ralf Holger, Dipl.-Phys. in Firma Rheinmetall GmbH Ulmenstrasse 125 Postfach 6609 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110720.4 | 07.09.1984 | [1985/31] | Priority number, date | DE19833343265 | 30.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3343265 | [1985/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0149717 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149717 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F42B13/38, F42C13/04, H01Q1/28 | [1985/31] | CPC: |
F42B12/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/31] | Title | German: | Geschosskopf | [1985/31] | English: | Projectile head | [1985/31] | French: | Tête d'obus | [1985/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/32] | 16.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2207557 [ ] (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | US4050381 [ ] (HEINEMANN ROBERT W); | DE2831378 [ ] (RHEINMETALL GMBH) | Examination | DE1159771 |