EP0136599 - Barium ferrite magnetic powder and recording medium employing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1989 [1989/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubo, Osamu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nomura, Tutomu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ido, Tadashi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/15] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110769.1 | 10.09.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | JP19830180396 | 30.09.1983 Original published format: JP 18039683 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136599 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136599 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136599 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/706, H01F1/11 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
G11B5/70678 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/15] | G11B5/706 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/15] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Bariumferritpulver und Aufzeichnungsträger der dieses enthält | [1988/26] | English: | Barium ferrite magnetic powder and recording medium employing the same | [1985/15] | French: | Poudre magnétique de ferrite de baryum et milieu d'enregistrement l'utilisant | [1988/26] |
Former [1985/29] | Magnetisches Bariumferritpulver und seine Verwendung in einem Aufzeichnungsträger | ||
Former [1985/29] | Poudre magnétique de ferrite de baryum et son application dans un milieu d'enseignement | Examination procedure | 12.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 25.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | USRE26153E [ ]; | US3833412 [ ] (AKASHI G, et al); | US3859130 [ ] (PARKER CHARLES C, et al); | EP0086444 [ ] (TDK CORP [JP]) |