EP0143227 - Electro-magnetic stepping motor with two coupled rotors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omega SA Rue Stämpfli 96 2500 Bienne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states Omega SA Rue Stämpfli 96 CH-2500 Bienne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mai, Tu Xuan Rue Blancherie 34 CH-1022 Chavannes / CH | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [1985/51] | de Raemy, Jacques ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [1985/23] | de Raemy, Jacques ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 84110853.3 | 12.09.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | CH19830005049 | 16.09.1983 Original published format: CH 504983 | [1985/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143227 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143227 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G04C13/11, H02K16/02 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
G04C13/11 (EP,US);
H02K16/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/23] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetischen Schrittmotor mit zwei gekuppelten Rotoren | [1985/23] | English: | Electro-magnetic stepping motor with two coupled rotors | [1985/23] | French: | Moteur électromagnétique pas à pas à deux rotors couplés | [1985/23] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 09.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP57116577 ; | [AP]EP0092521 (EBAUCHESFABRIK ETA AG [CH]) | [AD] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 211(E-137)(1089), 23 octobre 1982; & JP - A - 57 116 577 (20-07-1982), & JP57116577 A 00000000 |