EP0141201 - Filtration devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Driscoll, Michael Ann 178 Springs Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
Edwards, James Herbert 46 Jefferson Road Winchester, MA 10890 / US | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84111000.0 | 14.09.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | US19830532733 | 15.09.1983 Original published format: US 532733 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141201 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/00, B01D29/26, F16L37/02 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
F16L37/02 (EP,US);
B01D29/17 (EP,US);
B01D29/216 (EP,US);
B01D29/54 (EP,US);
B01D63/12 (EP,US);
B01D65/00 (EP,US);
B01D2201/4084 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Filtervorrichtungen | [1985/20] | English: | Filtration devices | [1985/20] | French: | Dispositifs de filtration | [1985/20] | File destroyed: | 18.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 20.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 28.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/42] | 11.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.11.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3160588 (ALARIE ROBERT W); | [Y]US3494640 (COBERLY CLARENCE J, et al); | [YD]US3928204 (THOMAS FRANK A); | [A]DE2639587 (WAFILIN BV); | [A]GB1557899 (CONNELLY R F); | [A]US4257894 (BARNEY MARSHALL) |