EP0175009 - Matrix printer, in particular a matrix line printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann Tally Ges. mbH Zetschegasse 17 1232 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states Mannesmann Tally Ges. mbH Zetschegasse 17 A-1232 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pichler, Josef, Ing. Wiener Strasse 27c A-2483 Ebreichsdorf / AT | 02 /
Puchegger, Karl, Ing. Uferstrasse 58 A-2822 Föhrenau / AT | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Flaig, Siegfried Mannesmann AG Mannesmannufer 2 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | Flaig, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Mannesmann AG Mannesmannufer 2 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 84111106.5 | 18.09.1984 | [1986/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0175009 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175009 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/28 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
B41J25/006 (EP,US);
B41J29/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/13] | Title | German: | Matrixdrucker, insbesondere Matrixzeilendrucker | [1986/13] | English: | Matrix printer, in particular a matrix line printer | [1986/13] | French: | Imprimante matricielle, en particulier imprimante matricielle ligne par ligne | [1986/13] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1985 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 09.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1360788 ; | [A]US3802544 (HOWARD R, et al); | [A]DE2443241 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG) |