EP0141216 - Servo control device for a hydro machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1988 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1988 [1988/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griese, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Lerchenweg 3 D-7115 Kupferell / DE | [1985/20] | Application number, filing date | 84111149.5 | 19.09.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | DE19830028832U | 06.10.1983 Original published format: DE 8328832 U | [1985/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141216 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141216 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/00, F04B49/08 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
F04B49/08 (EP,US);
F04B49/123 (EP,US);
F04B1/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1985/20] | Title | German: | Servoverstelleinrichtung für eine Hydromaschine | [1985/20] | English: | Servo control device for a hydro machine | [1985/20] | French: | Dispositif de servo-réglage pour une machine hydraulique | [1985/20] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/20] | 11.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2573863 (MITCHELL ALVA E); | [A]FR2184872 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE2443970 (TOKYO KEIKI KK) |