EP0141223 - Method for the production of an immobilized acylase and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/20] | Immobilized acylase, method for its production and its use | ||
[1987/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1988 [1988/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grabley, Susanne, Dr. Hölderlinstrasse 7 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Keller, Reinhold, Dr. Wiesenweg 5 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 03 /
Schlingmann, Merten, Dr. Schneidhainer Strasse 32a D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | [1985/20] | Application number, filing date | 84111208.9 | 20.09.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | DE19833334846 | 27.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3334846 | [1985/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141223 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141223 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/08, C12N11/02, C12N11/06, C12N9/48, C12P41/00 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
C12P41/007 (EP);
C12N11/091 (EP,US);
C12N11/089 (EP,US);
C12N11/098 (EP,US);
C12P13/04 (EP);
C12P37/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer immobilisierten Acylase und ihre Verwendung | [1987/43] | English: | Method for the production of an immobilized acylase and its use | [1987/43] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une acylase immobilisee et son utilisation | [1987/43] |
Former [1985/20] | Immobilisierte Acylase, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | ||
Former [1985/20] | Immobilized acylase, method for its production and its use | ||
Former [1985/20] | Acylase immobilisée, procédé pour sa préparation et son utilisation | Examination procedure | 19.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 12.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2336829 [ ]; | EP0037667 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | EP0052365 [ ] (GAMBRO DIALYSATOREN [DE]); | DE3131908 [ ] (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) |