EP0143253 - Lens casting mold and process for using same in making an optical lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1988 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1988 [1988/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barnes-Hind, Inc. 895 Kifer Road Sunnyvale California / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states Barnes-Hind, Inc. 895 Kifer Road Sunnyvale California / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rostoker, Martin V. 12589 Utopia Way San Diego California / US | 02 /
Jakoski, John C. 13226 Silver Saddle Lane Poway California / US | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | Brauns, Hans-Adolf, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | Brauns, Hans-Adolf, Dr. rer. nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84111471.3 | 26.09.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | US19830536430 | 27.09.1983 Original published format: US 536430 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143253 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143253 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, // B29L11:00 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
B29D11/00942 (EP);
B29C39/26 (EP);
B29D11/00038 (EP);
B29D11/0048 (EP);
B29C33/40 (EP);
B29K2901/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/23] | Title | German: | Linsengiessform und Verfahren zu deren Gebrauch bei der Herstellung einer optischen Linse | [1985/23] | English: | Lens casting mold and process for using same in making an optical lens | [1985/23] | French: | Moule pour couler des lentilles et procédé pour utiliser celui-ci lors de la fabrication d'une lentille optique | [1985/23] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 13.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3408429 [ ] (OTTO WICHTERLE); | US3555126 [ ] (GITSON ABRAHAM); | US3841598 [ ] (GRUCZA B); | US4155962 [ ] (NEEFE CHARLES W [US]); | US4188353 [ ] (NEEFE CHARLES W [US]); | US4252753 [ ] (RIPS IRVING); | US4285890 [ ] (MIZUTANI YUTAKA, et al); | US4307046 [ ] (NEEFE CHARLES W); | US4347198 [ ] (OHKADA SHINZO, et al) |