EP0141258 - Winding apparatus for forming a cotton wool package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Rene Im Eggli CH-8501 Niederneunforn / CH | [1985/20] | Application number, filing date | 84111525.6 | 27.09.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | CH19830005506 | 10.10.1983 Original published format: CH 550683 | [1985/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141258 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141258 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141258 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D01G27/02 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
D01G27/02 (EP,US);
Y10S242/918 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/20] | Title | German: | Wickelapparat zum Bilden von Wattewickeln | [1985/20] | English: | Winding apparatus for forming a cotton wool package | [1985/20] | French: | Dispositif de bobinage pour la formation d'enroulement d'ouate | [1985/20] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/24] | 28.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3122089 (SINCLAIR STUART W); | [Y]GB1150651 (TMM RESEARCH LTD); | [A]CH182356 (RIETER JOH JACOB & CIE AG [CH]); | [A]DE274246 |